Local Governing Committee
Local Governing Committee
The Governors work as a team under the authority of the Diocese of Arundel and Brighton and within the Xavier Catholic Education Trust Scheme of Delegation and are responsible for strategic oversight and making sure that the school provides the best possible education within a caring and supporting Catholic school environment.
The governing team, through the Governors Fund, continues to develop the school and facilities to create the best environment for the Marist Learners and Staff. Please click here to learn more about the fund and how to contribute. Thank you.
Governor Details
Full name of Governor |
Governor Category & Source of Appointment |
Term of office (Term of office is 4 years unless otherwise stated) |
Governor Roles & Committee Membership |
Declarations on register of business & pecuniary interest/ details of governorships at other schools |
From |
|
Emily Fanzo |
Headteacher Appointed by the Trust |
01/09/2023 – Ex officio |
Headteacher |
School employee |
|
|
Kate Licence (Headteacher) |
Executive Headteacher Appointed by the Trust |
01/09/2016 – Ex officio |
Executive Headteacher |
Trust employee |
|
|
Rhoda Breakell (Chair) |
Foundation Governor Appointed by the Diocese |
20/09/2021 – 19/09/2025 |
Chair Committees: HT Appraisal, Pay Lead: Safeguarding, Pupil Premium, Leadership, Trust Liaison |
Owner, The Orchard Nursery Ltd |
01/06/2010 |
|
Sue Jarrett |
Foundation Governor Appointed by the Diocese |
2/11/2022 – 1/11/2026 |
Admissions Committee (Chair) Lead: SEND, LAC/PLAC Website compliance (Autumn) |
None |
|
|
Margherita Lupi |
Foundation Governor Appointed by the Diocese |
21/02/2024 – 20/02/2028 |
To be confirmed |
None |
|
|
Leanne Oliver |
Staff Governor Elected by Staff |
12/09/2023 – 11/09/2023 |
Lead: Equality, Diversity & Inclusiveness |
School employee |
|
|
Kathryn O’Reilly |
Foundation Governor Appointed by the Diocese |
11/10/2023 – 10/10/2027 |
Admissions Committee Lead: Inclusive approach to the curriculum |
None |
|
|
Opeyemi Sebastian |
Parent Governor Elected by Parents |
1/09/2022 - 31/08/2026 |
Admissions Committee Lead: Health & Safety, Strong Leadership (SDP) |
Child attends the school |
|
|
Myooran Sithamparanathan |
Parent Elected by Parents |
11/12/2020 - 10/12/2024 |
Lead: Pupil attainment / progress Pupil Premium |
Child attends the school |
|
|
Eugene Smith |
Foundation Governor Appointed by the Diocese |
07/03/2023 – 06/03/2027 |
Vice Chair Pay Committee (Chair) Honorary Treasurer, Lead: Finance |
None |
|
|
We would like to thank the following Governors who have served over the last 12 months but who are no longer serving: |
Full name of Governor |
Governor Category |
Term of office |
Governor Roles & Committee Membership |
Declarations on register of business & pecuniary interest/ details of governorships at other schools |
|
Eleanor Grady |
Foundation Governor Appointed by the Diocese |
16/05/2023 – 23/05/2024 |
Pay Committee Lead: Catholic Ethos, Wellbeing |
Family member is employed in another school run by the Trust |
01/09/2019 |
Philip Haddow |
Foundation Governor Appointed by the Diocese |
1/09/2019 – 31/08/2023 |
Pay Committee Honorary Treasurer, Finance |
None |
|
Laura Plastow |
Foundation Governor Appointed by the Diocese |
27/10/2020 – 31/08/2023 |
Pay, Admissions Committees CLA/PLAC, Equalities, Health & Safety |
None |
|
The Governors of The Marist School believe it is important that committees reflect the diversity of the school communities they serve. Diverse committees promote inclusive school environments and provide diverse role models for staff and young people.
The Governors are currently collecting data on the diversity of the LGC, including data on age, gender and ethnicity. They will use that data to inform their recruitment and training needs and ensure there is always a diverse range of perspectives around the table to support robust decision making.
Due to our relatively small governing body we do not publish this diversity data online as individual governors could be identified and we have a legal obligation to protect their personal data.